+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (3)
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Transportation
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Transportation
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2024: Adopted
- Yeas: 31
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsors (106)
Type:
Primary Sponsor