+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On September 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Amended
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor