+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute Transportation and Public Safety
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Refer to Committee Transportation and Public Safety
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor