+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Government Oversight
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 95
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
March 1, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 13
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 15
+ − Sponsors (102)
Type:
Primary Sponsor