+ − Full Texts (22)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee Judiciary
On December 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2023 in the House:
- Passed
On October 11, 2023 in the House:
- Reported - Amended Criminal Justice
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Criminal Justice
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (10)
December 13, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 89
December 12, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
October 11, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
September 27, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 31
September 26, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 5
June 14, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
May 24, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 88
May 10, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
January 3, 2023: Adopted
- Yeas: 59
+ − Sponsors (112)
Type:
Primary Sponsor