+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (2)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to committee Primary and Secondary Education
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Analysis
+ − Fiscal Note
+ − Votes (9)
April 24, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
February 28, 2024: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
November 15, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
November 2, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 10
June 14, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 29
May 31, 2023: Passed
- Yeas: 32
May 30, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 6
May 24, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 12
May 22, 2023: Favorable Passage
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (124)
Type:
Primary Sponsor