+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed
- Reported - Substitute
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported - Substitute
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Committee
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported - Substitute
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Refer to Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor