+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Enacted, Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/12)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB346ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB346ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB346H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104295D-H1
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104295D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12100237D
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100237D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor