+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary and Secondary Education (Tata)
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 072364285-H1
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Administrative Action (Rapp)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072341285