+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/22
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 1
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:30
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
- Received from Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor