+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/03
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 1
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee