+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 21 nays 70
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee