+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 0
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 22, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee