+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/02
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 47 nays 45
On March 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 0
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee