+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/05
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee