+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 53
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 22
- Amendment adopted
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:44
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Magrum
Type:
Primary Sponsor