+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/23
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Division A passed
- Division of bill
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0
- Division B passed
- Second reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 32
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 14
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee