+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/01
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee