+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/16
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 60 nays 30
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Porter Rich S. Becker Mooney
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Anderson J. Lee Warner
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 67 nays 26
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:45
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee