+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/21
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 18
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor