+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee