+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/09
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 0
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee