+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/20
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/19
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee