+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/16
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Maragos M. Johnson P. Anderson
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Hogue Luick Nelson
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 4
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor