+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/27
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/26
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10, Emergency clause carried
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 1 3
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee