+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/01
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/01
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee