+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/15
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/15
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 3
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 10
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee