+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/24
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Emergency clause failed
- Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 35
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 3, Emergency clause carried
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee