+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 81
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:15
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee