+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/26
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Louser Laning Mooney
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Armstrong Lyson Grabinger
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 4
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee