+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/08
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
- Concurred
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee