+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/13
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 17
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 1
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee