+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/04
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 9
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Education
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee