+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee