+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Human Services
- Request return from committee
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Reported back, do pass 4 3 0
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee