+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/04
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3
- Concurred
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 27
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee