+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/28
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/27
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 22
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Owens Monson Zubke
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Schaible Lemm Conley
- Refused to concur
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 60 nays 29
- Emergency clause failed
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee