+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 65
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Satrom McWilliams Schreiber-Beck
- Appoint Rep. Skroch to replace Rep. Schreiber-Beck on conference committee
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Myrdal Klein O. Larsen
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 21
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 5 2
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 2
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee