+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/15
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee