+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/02
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 05/01
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 11
- Emergency clause carried
- Signed by Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Owens Monson Sanford
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Schaible Rust Marcellais
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 74 nays 19
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 1 2
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 04:00
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee