+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/12
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
- Concurred
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 01:30
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 08:40
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee