+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/16
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee