+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 63
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 2
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 13
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee