+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/20
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On March 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1
On January 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor