+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 51
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 0
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee