+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 1
- Emergency clause carried
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Damschen Skroch Fegley
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Anderson K. Roers Hogan
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee