+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/20
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 3
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On March 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee