+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/23
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/22
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 62 nays 29
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 4
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Longmuir Ertelt Fegley
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Kreun Burckhard D. Larsen
- Refused to concur
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 57 nays 36
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Political Subdivisions
- Request return from committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee