+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/02
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 05/02
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Silbernagel Damschen S. Kelsh
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Laffen Hogue Murphy
- Refused to concur
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Division A adopted
- Division of amendment
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 94 nays 0
- Division B adopted
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee