+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 4
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee